This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/16/2022 at 19:11:10 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC V ROJAS, JAIRO

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ROJAS, JAIRO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURKE , LAUREN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURKE , LAUREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant and Respondent

ROJAS , JAIRO

West Palm Beach, FL 33406-6838

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEHMANN , COLLEEN E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/16/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

06/16/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4505936

06/17/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4505936

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4505936; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/17/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/17/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: IL_FL@MCMCG.COM FOR DFT, E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 7/28/2022 2:00 PM BURKE, LAUREN; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 7/28/2022 2:00 PM BURKE, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4505936; Notes: $185.00 4505936 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E