This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/16/2022 at 19:12:59 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. V RODRIGUEZ, ROBERTO

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, ROBERTO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant and Respondent

RODRIGUEZ , ROBERTO

Loxahatchee, FL 33470-3489

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEHMANN , COLLEEN E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/16/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

06/16/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4505867

06/17/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4505867

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/17/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 4C (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED I ROBERTO RODRIGUEZ ROBERTO RODRIGUEZ - 06/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4505867; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/17/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/17/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: IL_FL@MCMCG.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 7/26/2022 10:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 7/26/2022 10:00 AM CASTOR, FRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4505867; Notes: $185.00 4505867 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E