Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 06/19/2021 at 18:52:21 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. V RODRIGUEZ, CIELO M

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, CIELO M. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant and Respondent

RODRIGUEZ , CIELO M

Delray Beach, FL 33484-1902

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

OBI ESQ, VALERIA

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/09/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4060597

06/10/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4060597

SUMMONS REQUESTED

06/09/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/09/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:4C (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4060597; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:06/10/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:06/10/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:IL_FL@MCMCG.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 7/20/2021 9:30 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 7/20/2021 9:30 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4060597; Notes:$310.00 4060597 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA