This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 06/28/2022 at 15:27:32 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. V LOVETT, LATRESSA S

Case Summary

On 05/19/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOVETT, LATRESSA S. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURKE , LAUREN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURKE , LAUREN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC.

Defendant and Respondent

LOVETT , LATRESSA S

Lake Worth, FL 33460-1846

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

GROSSMAN , LISA

LEHMANN , COLLEEN E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/19/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

05/19/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

05/19/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4472380

05/20/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4472380

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/20/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

06/10/2022:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

06/13/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

06/16/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLT ATTY PRESENT DFT NO APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: LIMITED BY LISA ANN GROSSMAN ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: NON-SERVICE RETURN LATRESSA S LOVETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4472380; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/20/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 05/20/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: IL_FL@MCMCG.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 6/16/2022 2:00 PM BURKE, LAUREN; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 6/16/2022 2:00 PM BURKE, LAUREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4472380; Notes: $310.00 4472380 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E