This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/18/2021 at 19:04:50 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. V KEARNEY, ANGEL S

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEARNEY, ANGEL S. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant and Respondent

KEARNEY , ANGEL S

Greenacres, FL 33413

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

LEHMANN , COLLEEN E

GROSSMAN , LISA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/14/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

10/14/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

10/14/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4213034

10/15/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4213034

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

11/02/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

11/12/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:4C (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:LIMITED, PBC F/B PAYAL CHATANI OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:NON-SERVICE RETURN ANGEL S KEARNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4213034; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/15/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:10/15/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:IL_FL@MCMCG.COM SUMMONS E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 11/16/2021 9:30 AM CASTOR, FRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 11/16/2021 9:30 AM CASTOR, FRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4213034; Notes:$185.00 4213034 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSSMAN , LISA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEHMANN, COLLEEN E