This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/10/2021 at 19:04:34 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. V FINNELL, SEAN

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FINNELL, SEAN. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant and Respondent

FINNELL , SEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

OBI , VALERIA

GROSSMAN , LISA

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/09/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL HRG. PENDING SERVICE -JUDGE GARRISON 8/05/2021

08/05/2021:ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL HRG. PENDING SERVICE -JUDGE GARRISON 8/05/2021

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

08/04/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4095345

07/08/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4095345

SUMMONS REQUESTED

07/06/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/06/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/06/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:6K (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:LIMITED PBC AS TO LISA ANN GROSSMAN F/B P CHATANI OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCancelled SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney on 8/10/2021 1:15:00 PM due to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL HRG. PENDING SERVICE -JUDGE GARRISON 8/05/2021; Notes:CONTINUING PRETRIAL HRG. PENDING SERVICE -JUDGE GARRISON 8/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:NON-SERVICE RETURN SEAN FINNELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4095345; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/08/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/08/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:IL_FL@MCMCG.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 8/10/2021 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 8/10/2021 1:15 PM GARRISON, EDWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4095345; Notes:$310.00 4095345 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA