Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 06/19/2021 at 18:52:50 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC. V CASTILLA, JORGE

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASTILLA, JORGE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GARRISON , EDWARD A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GARRISON , EDWARD A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC.

Defendant and Respondent

CASTILLA , JORGE

Boynton Beach, FL 33437-3958

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

OBI ESQ, VALERIA

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/18/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/09/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4060581

06/10/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4060581

SUMMONS REQUESTED

06/09/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/09/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:6K (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JORGE CASTILLA - 06/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4060581; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:06/10/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:06/10/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:IL_FL@MCMCG.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 7/20/2021 1:15 PM GARRISON, JUDGEEDWARD A; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 7/20/2021 1:15 PM GARRISON, JUDGEEDWARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4060581; Notes:$310.00 4060581 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RL: County Civil Central - RL (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:E-FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA