This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/05/2021 at 13:01:46 (UTC).

MIDDELHOF, MARIANA V SANCHEZ, CARLOS

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 MIDDELHOF, MARIANA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SANCHEZ, CARLOS. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHNSON , LAURA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JOHNSON , LAURA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MIDDELHOF , MARIANA

Defendant and Respondent

SANCHEZ , CARLOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CHAYKIN , JARED BENJAMIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CARLOS SANCHEZ - 07/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4089810; Receipt Amount: $419.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$419.00; total Amount Paid:$419.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/02/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:07/02/2021; Description:700FF Family Dissolution of Marriage PB_070117PB; Amount Due:$409.00; Amount Paid:$409.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketPAID $419.00 ON RECEIPT 4089810; Notes:$419.00 4089810 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FD: Family Central - FD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND RELATED RELIEF F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:eservice@chaykinlaw.com TO: CARLOS SANCHEZ F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketORDER/PARENT CLASS-AO 5.212; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL DATE OF BIRTH; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSOC SEC NO FILED; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:F/B ATTY CHAYKIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAILADDRESSES F/B ATTY CHAYKIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAYKIN , JARED BENJAMIN