This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/05/2019 at 17:33:32 (UTC).

MICHAEL, RAYMOND THOMAS

Case Summary

On 01/29/2019 MICHAEL, RAYMOND THOMAS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSKAUER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SUSKAUER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court

MICHAEL , SETH A

Decedent

MICHAEL , RAYMOND THOMAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

FREEMAN , HARRIET RAE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS; Notes:DOP 2/12/2019 F/B ATTY FREEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • NOTICE TO CREDITORS; Notes:(AMENDED) DOP-2/12/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • PAID $15.00 ON RECEIPT 3024300; Notes:$15.00 3024300 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION BOOK 30407 PAGE 202-202; Notes: SIGNED 2/5/19 JUDGE SUSKAUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • ORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REP; Notes: SIGNED 2/5/19 JUDGE SUSKAUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • CLERK NOTICE NOT CONFIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B ATTY FREEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3018756; Notes:$401.00 3018756 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IJ: North Branch Probate - IJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • OATH; Notes:OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B SETH A MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:LISA A ADSERBALLES WAIVER OF NOTICE AND HEARING OF SETH A MICHAEL AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF BOND REQUIREMENT FOR PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • WAIVER AND CONSENT; Notes:SETH A MICHAELS WAIVER OF NOTICE AND HEARING OF SETH A MICHAEL AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND WAIVER OF BOND REQUIREMENT FOR PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B ATTY FREEMAN OBO SETH A MICHAEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Receipt Number:3024300; Receipt Amount: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Receipt Number:3018756; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$416.00; total Amount Paid:$416.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Due Date:02/05/2019; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$15.00; Amount Paid:$15.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Due Date:01/31/2019; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less