This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/13/2023 at 22:45:43 (UTC).

MEZIER, CARMEL V LANIER, REGINALD

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 MEZIER, CARMEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LANIER, REGINALD. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MEZIER , CARMEL

Defendants and Respondents

LANIER , LILY

LANIER , REGINALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BRESSLER , IAN M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/04/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/04/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/04/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/04/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/04/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/04/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/04/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4732525

01/05/2023:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4732525

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/16/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

01/16/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED LILY LANIER - 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED REGINALD LANIER - 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4732525; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $421.00; total Amount Paid: $421.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/05/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/05/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/05/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4732525; Notes: $421.00 4732525 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ian@ianbresslerlaw.com;cy@ianbresslerlaw.com;jason@hurtfirm.com ISSUED TO REGINALD LANIER EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ian@ianbresslerlaw.com;cy@ianbresslerlaw.com;jason@hurtfirm.com ISSUED TO LILY LANIER EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DFT REGINALD LANIER F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SERVICE FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DFT LILY LANIER F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less