This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 03/25/2022 at 19:46:02 (UTC).

MERCEDES BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC V HEFTA PERFECT INC

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 MERCEDES BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HEFTA PERFECT INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GILLMAN , PAIGE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GILLMAN , PAIGE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MERCEDES BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC

Defendants and Respondents

H GREGG NISSAN DELRAY LLC

HEFTA PERFECT INC

RODRIGUEZ , ADA GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

WILSON , PAUL E

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/28/2022:COMPLAINT

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE REMOVE CASE NUMBER, SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY

02/28/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE REMOVE CASE NUMBER, SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

02/28/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

02/28/2022:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4368144

03/02/2022:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4368144

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/07/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4376899

03/08/2022:PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4376899

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/21/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/21/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/21/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURNOF SERVICE SERVED ADA GONZALEZ RODRIGUEZ - 03/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED REGISTERED AGENT: ADA GONZALEZ RODRIGUEZ - 03/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, H GREG NISSAN DELRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4376899; Receipt Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$431.00; total Amount Paid:$431.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/08/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/08/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/08/2022; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4376899; Notes:$30.00 4376899 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4368144; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • FinancialDue Date:03/02/2022; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4368144; Notes:$401.00 4368144 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes:4368144 $10.00 Wilson Law Firm Sout

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AK: Circuit Civil Central - AK (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.; Notes:pwilson@paulwilsonesq.com;india.gaines@paulwilsonesq.com SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.; Notes:pwilson@paulwilsonesq.com;india.gaines@paulwilsonesq.com SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED PLEASE REMOVE CASE NUMBER, SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.; Notes:pwilson@paulwilsonesq.com;india.gaines@paulwilsonesq.com PLEASE REMOVE CASE NUMBER, SUMMONS NOT PAID FOR, CASE MANAGEMENT STANDING ORDER MUST BE ATTACHED TO THE SUMMONS PER AO 3.107. GO TO WWW.15THCIRCUIT.COM/CIVIL-DIFFERENTIATED-FORMS-AND-ORDERS TO DOWNLOAD A COPY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR DAMAGES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ FINANCIAL SERVICES USA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AS SERVICER FOR DAIMLER TRUST A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wilson, Paul E