This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/17/2021 at 15:22:14 (UTC).

MENARD, SONIA M V MENARD, JOSEPH HENRY JR

Case Summary

On 08/26/2020 MENARD, SONIA M filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MENARD, JOSEPH HENRY JR. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSKAUER , SCOTT and WILLIS , SARAH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SUSKAUER , SCOTT

WILLIS , SARAH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MENARD , SONIA M

Defendant and Respondent

MENARD JR, JOSEPH HENRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MCNAMARA , KEVIN LEE

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

SAWICKI , MARK EUGENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:F/B ATTY SAWICKI OBO RESP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:AMENDED TO HUSBAND'S COUNTER PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE -NAME/ADDRESS CHANGE; Notes:LAW FIRM F/B ATTY MCNAMARA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:TO HUSB'S COUNTERPETITION FOR DISS OF MARR F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JOSEPH HENRY MENARD, JR - 09-08-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes:UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3756252; Receipt Amount: $295.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$714.00; total Amount Paid:$714.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:09/25/2020; Description:7CTP CA Family Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due:$295.00; Amount Paid:$295.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPAID $295.00 ON RECEIPT 3756252; Notes:$295.00 3756252 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:FJ: Family North County - FJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:KLM@MCNAMARA-LAW.COM JOSEPH HENRY MENARD JR 100 SHERWOOD CIR. APT 20C JUPITER FL 33458

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY MCNAMARA OBO PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY MCNAMARA OBO PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILING; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSOC SEC NO FILED; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT UCC JURIS ACT; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes:F/B PET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNAMARA, KEVIN