This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/27/2021 at 20:02:39 (UTC).

MEB LOAN TRUST III US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE V FALLO, LAWRENCE JR

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 MEB LOAN TRUST III US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against FALLO, LAWRENCE JR. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KASTRENAKES , JOHN S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KASTRENAKES , JOHN S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MEB LOAN TRUST III US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE

Defendants and Respondents

CYPRESS WOODS ASSOCIATION INC

CYPRESS WOODS LAKE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION INC

FALLO , ANGELA

FALLO JR, LAWRENCE

MMR DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION

SUMMER CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

TENANT I UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT II UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT III UNKNOWN TENANT

TENANT IV UNKNOWN TENANT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ANGELA FALLO

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LAWRENCE FALLO JR

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

NUSSBAUM , WILLIAM

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

SUGARMAN , DEBORAH S

KESTEN , ROBERT M

QUINONES , TIMOTHY

 

Court Documents

ANSWER

07/22/2021:ANSWER

RESPONSE TO: MOTION FOR EXTENSION (F/B PLT)

07/22/2021:RESPONSE TO: MOTION FOR EXTENSION (F/B PLT)

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMLAINT (F/B DFTS LAWRENCE FALLO JR. AND ANGELA FALLO)

07/20/2021:MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMLAINT (F/B DFTS LAWRENCE FALLO JR. AND ANGELA FALLO)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/20/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/19/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/08/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/06/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/01/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/01/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/21/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/21/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM

06/21/2021:NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM

NOTICE CERTIFICATION AS TO CARES ACT AND EXECUTIVE ORDER 20-180 F/B PLT

06/21/2021:NOTICE CERTIFICATION AS TO CARES ACT AND EXECUTIVE ORDER 20-180 F/B PLT

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

06/21/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/21/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS

06/21/2021:LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

06/21/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/21/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED BY CYPRESS WOODS ASSOCIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: MOTION FOR EXTENSION (F/B PLT); Notes:MOTION FOR EXTENSION (F/B PLT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMLAINT (F/B DFTS LAWRENCE FALLO JR. AND ANGELA FALLO); Notes:FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMLAINT (F/B DFTS LAWRENCE FALLO JR. AND ANGELA FALLO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:QUINONES LAW P.A. AS COUNSEL OBO DFTS LAWRENCE FALLO JR., AND ANGELA FALLO (F/B TIMOTHY QUINONES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED SUMMER CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. VIDA CYPRESS WOODS IL ASSOCIATION, INC - 07/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED CYPRESS WOODS LAKE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION, INC - 06/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED CYPRESS WOODS ASSOCIATION, INC CYPRESS WOODS I ASSOCIATION, INC - 06/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED MMR DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION - 06/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE LAWRENCE FALLO, JR - 06/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF NON-SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LAWRENCE FALLO, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Pleadings@Gassellaw.com;Efiling@Gassellaw.com;EPortal@Gassellaw.com AS TO DFT CYPRESS WOODS LAKE MAINTENANCE ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Pleadings@Gassellaw.com;Efiling@Gassellaw.com;EPortal@Gassellaw.com AS TO DFT CYPRESS WOODS ASSOCIATION INC FKA CYPRESS WOODS I ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Pleadings@Gassellaw.com;Efiling@Gassellaw.com;EPortal@Gassellaw.com AS TO DFT ANGELA FALLO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE FORM; Notes:2010CA023212 F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE CERTIFICATION AS TO CARES ACT AND EXECUTIVE ORDER 20-180 F/B PLT; Notes:CERTIFICATION AS TO CARES ACT AND EXECUTIVE ORDER 20-180 F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY GASSEL OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSSCLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COUNTER-PETITION/THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32624 PAGE 671-672; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:(VERIFIED) FOR FORECLOSURE OF MORTGAGE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meb Loan Trust Iii Us Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nussbaum, William