Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 07/11/2019 at 14:37:47 (UTC).

MCGOWN, MICHAEL P V VAN RENSBURG, NICOLE

Case Summary

On 01/21/2019 MCGOWN, MICHAEL P filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VAN RENSBURG, NICOLE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MCGOWN , MICHAEL P

Defendants and Respondents

HOLLANDER , NATE

VAN RENSBURG , NICOLE

HOLLANDER MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

HOLLANDER , WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

PELLGRINO , TARA SUZANNE

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30407 PAGE 943-943

02/06/2019:ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30407 PAGE 943-943

MOTION (JOINT) FOR APPROVAL OF PRE-JUDGMENT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION FILED BY PLT

02/04/2019:MOTION (JOINT) FOR APPROVAL OF PRE-JUDGMENT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION FILED BY PLT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/26/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/26/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/26/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

01/26/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

ACCEPTANCE

01/25/2019:ACCEPTANCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/25/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3006330

01/23/2019:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3006330

COMPLAINT

01/21/2019:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/21/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 30407 PAGE 943-943; Notes:J NUTT: AND APPROVING PRE-JUDGMENT SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT DTD 02/05/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION (JOINT) FOR APPROVAL OF PRE-JUDGMENT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION FILED BY PLT; Notes:(JOINT) FOR APPROVAL OF PRE-JUDGMENT SETTLEMENT STIPULATION FILED BY PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, WILLIAM HOLLANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, NATE HOLLANDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, NICOLE VAN RENSBURG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, HOLLANDER MANAGEMENT GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACCEPTANCE; Notes:AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OBO DFT HOLLANDER MANAGEMENT GROUP; NICOLE VAN RENSBURG, WILLIAM HOLLANDER AND NATE HOLLANDER (F/B BRIAN KOPELOWITZ ESQ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3006330; Notes:$401.00 3006330 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Receipt Number:3006330; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$401.00; total Amount Paid:$401.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Due Date:01/23/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Pellegrino, Tara S