This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/05/2019 at 19:50:05 (UTC).

MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD PLLC V HOLMES, TERRY

Case Summary

On 10/31/2019 MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD PLLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against HOLMES, TERRY. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLEY , GLENN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLEY , GLENN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD PLLC

Defendant and Respondent

HOLMES , TERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

FARACH , MANUEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/31/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

10/31/2019:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/31/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3402843

11/04/2019:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3402843

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/14/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

11/22/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/02/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT TERRY HOLMES AKA TERRY HOLMES BEAR CLERKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED TERRY HOLMES AKA TERRY HOLMES BEACH - 11/9/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED TERRY HOLMES AKA TERRY HOLMES BEAR - 11/9/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3402843; Notes:$411.00 3402843 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:mfarach@mcglinchey.com;ajairam@mcglinchey.com;dhalperin@mcglinchey.com TERRY HOLMES AKA TERRY HOLMES BEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FB PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3402843; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/04/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/04/2019; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARACH, MANUEL