This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 21:30:22 (UTC).

MCCURDY CENTER, LTD. DBA QUIET WATERS V TORRES, MILAGROS

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 MCCURDY CENTER, LTD DBA QUIET WATERS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TORRES, MILAGROS. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MCCURDY CENTER, LTD. DBA QUIET WATERS

Defendant and Respondent

TORRES , MILAGROS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

11/23/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4691506

11/28/2022:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4691506

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/07/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/07/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/30/2022:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: OF PLT'S CLAIM FOR POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes: MILAGROS TORRES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED MILAGROS TORRES - 12/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4691506; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/28/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/28/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4691506; Notes: $195.00 4691506 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: service@barfieldpa.com;rmccain@barfieldpa.com;dbarfield@barfieldpa.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less