This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 03/10/2022 at 01:12:24 (UTC).

MAYS, MICHAEL V JOE TAYLOR RESTORATION INC

Case Summary

On 06/26/2020 MAYS, MICHAEL filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against JOE TAYLOR RESTORATION INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KERNER , SCOTT and NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KERNER , SCOTT

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

HENNESSEY , KALA

MGM RESTORATION LLC

MAYS , MICHAEL

Defendants and Respondents

RADEWICZ , KAREN

TAYLOR , BREEZE

TRUMBORE , JACKI

PADULA, BENNARDO, LEVINE LLP

DURKIN , CLEGG

TAYLOR , JOSEPH C

GETTY , AARON

JOE TAYLOR RESTORATION INC

GETTY , STEPHANIE

PENYAK , CATHY

NAUTH , DORA

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FARROW ESQ, JAY L

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WILKINS , ROBERT W

WHITE III, JOHN G

PADULA , STEPHEN J

GACHE , RONALD M

SIMON , SCOTT A

FARACH , MANUEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

06/26/2020:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

12/03/2021:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

ORDER GRANTING NUTT; DFT, KAREN RADEWICZ'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTYS' FEES AND COSTS AND DENYING PLTFS' MOTION TO STRIKE KAREN RADEWICXZ'S UNTIMELY MOTION FOR ATTY FEES; MOTIONS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART (SEE ORDER) DTD 11/22/2021

11/22/2021:ORDER GRANTING NUTT; DFT, KAREN RADEWICZ'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTYS' FEES AND COSTS AND DENYING PLTFS' MOTION TO STRIKE KAREN RADEWICXZ'S UNTIMELY MOTION FOR ATTY FEES; MOTIONS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART (SEE ORDER) DTD 11/22/2021

ORDER NUTT DTD 11/16/21: DFT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT OF ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS GRANTED

11/16/2021:ORDER NUTT DTD 11/16/21: DFT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT OF ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS GRANTED

AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING

11/03/2021:AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING

INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL

11/03/2021:INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

11/02/2021:DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

TRUE COPY

11/02/2021:TRUE COPY

TRANSCRIPT

10/29/2021:TRANSCRIPT

RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

10/28/2021:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/14/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

10/13/2021:NOTICE OF HEARING

INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL

10/12/2021:INDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL

AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING

10/12/2021:AUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

10/12/2021:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

TRUE COPY

10/08/2021:TRUE COPY

ORDER NUTT: ON DEFENDANTS VARIOUS MOTIONS FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEYS FEES. GRANTED AS IT RELATES TO JOE TAYLOR RESTORATION INC, JOE TAYLOR, CLEGG DURKIN AND AARON GETTY DTD 10-1-21 ***SEE ORDER***

10/01/2021:ORDER NUTT: ON DEFENDANTS VARIOUS MOTIONS FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTORNEYS FEES. GRANTED AS IT RELATES TO JOE TAYLOR RESTORATION INC, JOE TAYLOR, CLEGG DURKIN AND AARON GETTY DTD 10-1-21 ***SEE ORDER***

DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

09/27/2021:DIRECTIONS TO CLERK

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING NUTT; DFT, KAREN RADEWICZ'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTYS' FEES AND COSTS AND DENYING PLTFS' MOTION TO STRIKE KAREN RADEWICXZ'S UNTIMELY MOTION FOR ATTY FEES; MOTIONS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART (SEE ORDER) DTD 11/22/2021; Notes:NUTT; DFT, KAREN RADEWICZ'S MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT TO ATTYS' FEES AND COSTS AND DENYING PLTFS' MOTION TO STRIKE KAREN RADEWICXZ'S UNTIMELY MOTION FOR ATTY FEES; MOTIONS IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART (SEE ORDER) DTD 11/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER NUTT DTD 11/16/21: DFT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT OF ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS GRANTED; Notes:NUTT DTD 11/16/21: DFT'S MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR ENTITLEMENT OF ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTOMATIC RECEIPT APPELLATE FILING; Notes:2ND SUPPLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINDEX TO RECORD ON APPEAL; Notes:2ND SUPPLEMENT 21-1776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIRECTIONS TO CLERK; Notes:SECOND AMENDED F/B DFT/APPELLEES JOE TAYLOR RESTORATION INC AND JOE TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRUE COPY; Notes:4DCA ORDER APPELLANTS' 11/1/21 MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT; Notes:OF HEARING PROCEEDINGS DTD MAY 11, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRE-NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING (PREVIOUSLY SCHEDULED FOR 11/9/21 - MOVING RADEWICZ' MOTION ONLY) 11/17/2021 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 11/09/2021 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:06/29/2020; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:06/29/2020; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$15.00; Amount Paid:$15.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • FinancialDue Date:06/29/2020; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $446.00 ON RECEIPT 3665579; Notes:$446.00 3665579 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED NAME ON SUMMONS MUST MATCH NAME LISTED IN THE COMPLAINT; Notes:Jay@farrowlawfirm.com;meera@farrowlawfirm.com;service@farrowlawfirm.com NAME ON SUMMONS MUST MATCH NAME LISTED IN THE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Jay@farrowlawfirm.com;meera@farrowlawfirm.com;service@farrowlawfirm.com AS TO JAY TAYLOR RESTORATION, INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Jay@farrowlawfirm.com;meera@farrowlawfirm.com;service@farrowlawfirm.com AS TO BREEZE TAYLOR EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOE TAYLOR RESTORATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay L Farrow