This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/22/2023 at 16:28:24 (UTC).

MAYER, LORI V STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO

Case Summary

On 11/23/2022 MAYER, LORI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

MAYER , LORI

MAYER , ROBERT

Defendant and Respondent

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

JORDAN JR, ROY W

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MCLAUGLIN , BRYAN D

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

11/23/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/23/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4690170

11/23/2022:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4690170

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

12/08/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/20/2022:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/21/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/21/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

MOTION TO STRIKE

12/22/2022:MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/26/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/26/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

12/28/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/29/2022:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFFS LORI MAYER 04/11/2023 09:30:00 AM ROBERT MAYER 04/11/2023 01:30:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CONSORTIUM INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF ROBERT MAYER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STRIKE; Notes: MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES PLAINTIFF, LORI MAYER MOVES TO STRIKE THE FOLLOWING FROM THE FROM THE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - F/B ATTY BRYAN MCLAUGHLIN OBO DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4690170; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/23/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/23/2022; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4690170; Notes: $411.00 4690170 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: rjordan@rjordanlaw.com;vanessa@rjordanlaw.com AS TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE CO EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JORDAN JR, ROY W