This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/04/2021 at 19:53:53 (UTC).

MATTHEW, THERESA E V CROWELL, WILLIAM W

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 MATTHEW, THERESA E filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CROWELL, WILLIAM W. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ZUCKERMAN , ASHLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ZUCKERMAN , ASHLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MATTHEW , THERESA E

Defendants and Respondents

BEST BUY CO, INC.

CROWELL , WILLIAM W

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BOETTCHER , IAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LANFERSIEK , MARTINA

LYNOTT , MICHAEL J

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/01/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/27/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/27/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/27/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/27/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

COMPLAINT

07/27/2021:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/20/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

07/20/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

07/20/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4090193

07/02/2021:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4090193

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/30/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/30/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/30/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

06/30/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

COMPLAINT

06/30/2021:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/30/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED WILLIAM W. CROWELL - 07/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:(AMENDED) REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DFT BEST BUY STORES (F/B PLT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(AMENDED) TO DFT BEST BUY STORES (F/B PLT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:(AMENDED) REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DFT WILLIAM W. CROWELL (F/B PLT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(AMENDED) TO DFT WILLIAM W. CROWELL (F/B PLT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:(AMENDED) SAME PARTIES (F/B PLT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:PRESERVATION OF DEFENSES FILED BY ATTY LANFERSIEK OBO BEST BUY CO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:UPON PROPER SERVICE FILED BY ATTY LANFERSIEK OBO WILLIAM WENDALL CROWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:FILED BY ATTY LANFERSIEK OBO DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED BEST BUY CO., INC - 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4090193; Notes:$421.00 4090193 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT, WILLIAM W. CROWELL F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, WILLIAM W. CROWELL F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT. BEST BUY CO., INC. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, BEST BUY., INC. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:iboettcher@forthepeople.com;aroark@forthepeople.com;lesquivel@forthepeople.com ISSUED TO WILLIAM W. CROWELL EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:iboettcher@forthepeople.com;aroark@forthepeople.com;lesquivel@forthepeople.com ISSUED TO BEST BUY CO INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Best Buy Co. Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOETTCHER , IAN