Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/10/2021 at 19:56:34 (UTC).

MASSEY CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC V AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 MASSEY CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COATES JR, HOWARD K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COATES JR, HOWARD K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MASSEY CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC

Defendant and Respondent

AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ATKINSON , JOHN BOND

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/02/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

03/02/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/10/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3898989

02/05/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3898989

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/03/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/03/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/03/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/03/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/03/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/03/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/03/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/03/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:TO RESPOND TO PLT'S COMPLAINT - F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL - F/B ATTY TIFFANY A BUSTAMANTE OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS SERVED AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA - 02/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3898989; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/05/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/05/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 3898989; Notes:$411.00 3898989 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AN: Circuit Civil Central - AN (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFT DESIGNATED CORPORATE REP.; FB PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:(FIRST) TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO DEFT; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:Margaret@kwglegal.com;service@kwglegal.com;service@kwglegal.com AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR DAMAGES; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MASSEY CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC A/A/O GUDRUN ELLISON is a litigant

Latest cases where Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATKINSON, JOHN BOND