Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/21/2019 at 12:43:47 (UTC).

MARTINEZ, DAVID V FLF ATC LLC

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 MARTINEZ, DAVID filed an Other lawsuit against FLF ATC LLC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ROWE , CYMONIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ROWE , CYMONIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Respondents and Counter Defendants

MARTINEZ , DAVID

BOLANOS , MICHAEL

Defendants and Respondents

LUPTIN LLC

GARCIA , MARION

BOLANOS , MICHAEL R

FLF ATC LLC

COPACABANA CUBAN CUISINE

BOLANOS , STEVEN

GARCIA , GUSTAVO

Defendants, Respondents and Counter Defendants

LUPTIN LLC

MARTINEZ , DAVID

GARCIA , MARION

BOLANOS , MICHAEL R

FLF ATC LLC

COPACABANA CUBAN CUISINE

BOLANOS , STEVEN

GARCIA , GUSTAVO

Petitioner and Counter Plaintiff

BOLANOS , MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner, Respondent and Counter Defendant Attorneys

GREEN , ISHMAEL A

ROMAGUERA , CHRISTIAN

STUDLEY , RACHEL

SASSON , JAMIE ALAN

VANDENBERG , DENNIS A

FIORELLO ESQ, MATTHEW A

Petitioner, Respondent, Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

ROMAGUERA , CHRISTIAN

STUDLEY , RACHEL

SASSON , JAMIE ALAN

VANDENBERG , DENNIS A

FIORELLO ESQ, MATTHEW A

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION

08/19/2019:STIPULATION

ORDER SETTING HEARING

06/13/2019:ORDER SETTING HEARING

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

06/03/2019:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

05/04/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

04/19/2019:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

04/16/2019:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/15/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/05/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO STRIKE

02/12/2019:MOTION TO STRIKE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/07/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 3026619

02/06/2019:PAID $395.00 ON RECEIPT 3026619

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/05/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/28/2019:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/20/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/20/2018:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $405.50 ON RECEIPT 2957610

12/13/2018:PAID $405.50 ON RECEIPT 2957610

COMPLAINT

12/12/2018:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/12/2018:CIVIL COVER SHEET

72 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION; Notes:(JOINT) FOR MUTUAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLT AND DFT BOLANOS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS; Notes:AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLT'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT F/B DFT LUPTIN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RE-NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:RE-NOTICE OF HEARING 08/29/2019 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS F/B DFT COPACABANA; Notes:TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS F/B DFT COPACABANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Notes:SECOND AMENDED - F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Notes:NOTICE OF HEARING 08/29/2019 08:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING; Notes:ROWE DTD 7/17/2019 ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SHALL BE RESET ON OCTOBER 4, 2019 @ 8:30 AM COURTROOM 10C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ROWE ON DFT LUPTIN LLC D/B/A COPACABANA'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLT'S AMENDED COMPLAINT - DENIED AS MOOT, AS PLT INTENDS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT. AMENDED PLEADING MUST BE FILED WITHIN 10 DAYS. DFT HAS 20 DAYS THEREAFTER TO FILE A RESPONSE. DTD 7/17/19; Notes:ROWE ON DFT LUPTIN LLC D/B/A COPACABANA'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE PLT'S AMENDED COMPLAINT - DENIED AS MOOT, AS PLT INTENDS TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT. AMENDED PLEADING MUST BE FILED WITHIN 10 DAYS. DFT HAS 20 DAYS THEREAFTER TO FILE A RESPONSE. DTD 7/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY/RESPONSE; Notes:IN OPPOSITION TO LUPTIN LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO COMPEL; Notes:BETTER RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES - F/B DFT LUPTIN LLC D/B/A COPACABANA

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • Due Date:02/06/2019; Description:8CTP CA General Cross Counter 3rd Party PB_070117; Amount Due:$395.00; Amount Paid:$395.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Due Date:12/21/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Due Date:12/21/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Due Date:12/21/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Due Date:12/21/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Due Date:12/21/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Due Date:12/21/2018; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Due Date:12/13/2018; Description:Efile fee INDX $1 fee party after 4; Amount Due:$2.00; Amount Paid:$2.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Due Date:12/13/2018; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$2.50; Amount Paid:$2.50; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Due Date:12/13/2018; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMAGUERA , CHRISTIAN