This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/04/2023 at 16:26:04 (UTC).

MARMARA PROPERTIES LLC V FLORES, JOSE JUAN III

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 MARMARA PROPERTIES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLORES, JOSE JUAN III. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is TEW , STEPHANIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

TEW , STEPHANIE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MARMARA PROPERTIES LLC

Defendant and Respondent

FLORES III, JOSE JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY , JERRON

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

01/30/2023:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4761099

01/31/2023:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4761099

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/02/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED JOSE JUAN FLORES III - 02/01/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4761099; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $195.00; total Amount Paid: $195.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/31/2023; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 4761099; Notes: $195.00 4761099 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@kelleygrantlaw.com E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less