This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/13/2023 at 22:25:56 (UTC).

MARKS, CHERYL V COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/16/2022 MARKS, CHERYL filed an Other lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MARKS , CHERYL

Defendants and Respondents

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

UNKNOWN MANAGER

WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEWIS , YASMEEN A

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

BEDARD , BENJAMIN L

DRAHOS , DAVID M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO SUBPOENAS TO NON- PARTIES

12/28/2022:NOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO SUBPOENAS TO NON- PARTIES

OBJECTION

12/22/2022:OBJECTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

12/12/2022:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

12/07/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

12/07/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

11/18/2022:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

11/18/2022:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

11/16/2022:RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

11/16/2022:ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4398908

03/24/2022:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4398908

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/16/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/16/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/16/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

03/16/2022:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/16/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/16/2022:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/16/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO SUBPOENAS TO NON- PARTIES; Notes: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO SUBPOENAS TO NON- PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION; Notes: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY AND SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION FROM DEFENDANT, COSTCO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (FLA. R. CIV. P. RULE 1.351

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 12/07/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, COSTCO WHOLESALE CORP.'S, FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, WIRELESS ADVOCATES, LLC'S SLIP AND FALL INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO SLIP AND FALL INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes: FIFTH RE-NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO-TAPED DEPOSITION CHERYL MARKS 11/17/2022 01:00:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4398908; Notes: $421.00 4398908 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AE: Circuit Civil Central - AE (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO DFT WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SLIP AND FALL INTERROGATORIES TO DFT WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SLIP AND FALL INTERROGATORIES TO DFT COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: yasmeenlewisteam@searcylaw.com;tthillberg@searcylaw.com;_searcyteam@searcylaw.com ISSUED TO COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: yasmeenlewisteam@searcylaw.com;tthillberg@searcylaw.com;_searcyteam@searcylaw.com ISSUED TO WIRELESS ADVOCATES LLC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less