This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 12/21/2018 at 17:32:30 (UTC).

MANZANO, JOSEPH FRANCIS

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 MANZANO, JOSEPH FRANCIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BURTON , CHARLES E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BURTON , CHARLES E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

VILLA , ROSE

Decedent

MANZANO , JOSEPH FRANCIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

DALMEIDA , ARTHUR B

SHAMEL JR, C RICHARD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2018
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:FOR LINDA C JOHSON COPY EFILED F/B ATTY SHAMEL JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • EXPARTE CLERKS MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • PAID $18.00 ON RECEIPT 2940876; Notes:$18.00 2940876 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • OATH; Notes:OF PR DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT, AND ACCEPTANCE F/B ROSE VILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • NON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:F/B ROSE VILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • WILL; Notes:EFILED COPY OF JOSEPH F MANZANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DEATH CERTIFICATE; Notes:EFILED COPY OF LINDA C JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:EFILED COPY OF JOSEPH FRANCIS MANZANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • ACCEPTANCE; Notes:OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B RICHARD SHAMEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL OF JOSPEH FRANCIS MANZANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • WILL; Notes:ORIGINAL OF JOSEPH F MANZANO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 2927993; Notes:$401.00 2927993 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IY: South Branch Probate - IY (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B ATTY SHAMEL, JR. AND ATTY D'ALAMEIDA OBO ROSE VILLA E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Receipt Number:2940876; Receipt Amount: $18.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Receipt Number:2927993; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$419.00; total Amount Paid:$419.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Due Date:11/30/2018; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$18.00; Amount Paid:$18.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Due Date:11/19/2018; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less