This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/25/2022 at 22:43:19 (UTC).

MALLEN, MICHAEL JOHN V MALLEN, MICHAEL LUIS

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 MALLEN, MICHAEL JOHN filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MALLEN, MICHAEL LUIS. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DELGADO , LUIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DELGADO , LUIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MALLEN , MICHAEL JOHN

Defendants and Respondents

MALLEN , MICHAEL LUIS

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRISTATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR CTX MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LUBLINER , RICHARD SCOTT

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/15/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

09/15/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $926.00 ON RECEIPT 4617901

09/19/2022:PAID $926.00 ON RECEIPT 4617901

COMPLAINT

09/19/2022:COMPLAINT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/01/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/06/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC CTX MORTGAGE COMPANY - 09/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MICHAEL LUIS MALLEN - 09/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4617901; Receipt Amount: $926.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $926.00; total Amount Paid: $926.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/19/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/19/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 09/19/2022; Description: 800F2 CircCivil Real Prop $50,001 < $250,000 PB; Amount Due: $906.00; Amount Paid: $906.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: AMENDED - F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $926.00 ON RECEIPT 4617901; Notes: $926.00 4617901 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: rich@lubliner-law.com;carolina@lubliner-law.com ISSUED TO MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC AS NOMINEE FOR CTX MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: rich@lubliner-law.com;carolina@lubliner-law.com ISSUED TO MICHAEL LUIS MALLEN EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lubliner, Richard S