This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 08/27/2021 at 19:57:33 (UTC).

MAJOR, DAVID V GRAY, PATRICK J

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 MAJOR, DAVID filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GRAY, PATRICK J. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MAJOR , DAVID

Defendants and Respondents

AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS INC

GRAY , PATRICK J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BOETTCHER , IAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

TARLOW , DAVID M

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

08/24/2021:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/16/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/16/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/16/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/16/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/11/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

08/11/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

08/08/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4115329

07/23/2021:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4115329

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/22/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/22/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/22/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

07/22/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

07/22/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/22/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY DAVID TARLOW OBO DFT PATRICK J GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AS COUNSEL FOR AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS INC FILED BY ATTY TARLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS INC - 8/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SUBSTITUTE PATRICK J. GRAY - 07/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4115329; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4115329; Notes:$421.00 4115329 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFT AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS INC; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DEFT AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS INC; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFT PATRICK J GRAY; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DEFT PATRICK J GRAY; F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:iboettcher@forthepeople.com;aroark@forthepeople.com;lesquivel@forthepeople.com AMERICAN RESIDENTIAL PRODUCTS INC SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:iboettcher@forthepeople.com;aroark@forthepeople.com;lesquivel@forthepeople.com PATRICK J GRAY SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOETTCHER , IAN