This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/27/2019 at 15:12:23 (UTC).

MAGAZINE GARDENS EAST LP DBA GARDENS EAST V DANIELS, NATASHA

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 MAGAZINE GARDENS EAST LP DBA GARDENS EAST filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DANIELS, NATASHA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MAGAZINE GARDENS EAST LP DBA GARDENS EAST

Defendant and Respondent

DANIELS , NATASHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MCCAIN , RYAN R

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

11/08/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31014 PAGE 1581-1581

11/07/2019:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31014 PAGE 1581-1581

CLERK'S DEFAULT

11/07/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

11/05/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

11/05/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

11/05/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/31/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/25/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3386543

10/24/2019:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3386543

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/23/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/23/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/23/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes:FORWARD TO PBSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes:DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 31014 PAGE 1581-1581; Notes:SIGNED ON 11/6/19 BY JDG F. CASTOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:SERVICE@BARFIELDPA.COM TO DFT. E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:AS TO NATASHA DANIELS AND AFFIDAVIT OF NON PSYMENT OF RENT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes:DEFAULT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:AS TO NATASHA DANIELS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE POSTED NATASHA DANIELS - 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3386543; Notes:$195.00 3386543 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:DSETARO@BARFIELDPA.COM;RMCCAIN@BARFIELDPA.COM;SERVICE@BARFIELDPA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Receipt Number:3386543; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$195.00; total Amount Paid:$195.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Due Date:10/24/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • Due Date:10/24/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less