This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 09/29/2021 at 20:05:32 (UTC).

MAGANA, BELINDA V PEREZ GARCIA DMD, RAMON A

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 MAGANA, BELINDA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against PEREZ GARCIA DMD, RAMON A. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MAGANA , BELINDA

Defendants and Respondents

DELRAY 505 RE LLC

OMSA DELRAY BEACH PA

PEREZ GARCIA DMD , RAMON A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEVINE , LISA S

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MORGAN JR, KENNETH W

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

09/10/2021:COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4178406; Receipt Amount: $30.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$431.00; total Amount Paid:$431.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/17/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/17/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/17/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 4178406; Notes:$30.00 4178406 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketACCEPTANCE; Notes:OF SERVICE OF PROCESS F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B ATTY KENNETH MORGAN JR OBO DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DFT DELRAY 505 RE LLC. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DFT OMSA DELRAY BEACH PA. F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4154168; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/26/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4154168; Notes:$401.00 4154168 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AH: Circuit Civil Central - AH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FILED BY BELINDA MAGANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FILED BY BELINDA MAGANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:FILED BY BELINDA MAGANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:FILED BY BELINDA MAGANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FILED BY BELINDA MAGANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVINE, LISA SUE