This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 12/31/2019 at 19:56:35 (UTC).

MADISON ALAMOSA HECM LLC V WEINBERG, MARTIN BRUCE

Case Summary

On 11/26/2019 MADISON ALAMOSA HECM LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WEINBERG, MARTIN BRUCE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KERNER , SCOTT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KERNER , SCOTT

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

MADISON ALAMOSA HECM LLC

Defendants and Respondents

WEINBERG , MARTIN BRUCE

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARTIN BRUCE WEINBERG

BRIDGEVIEW ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST EILEEN WEINBERG DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

HAKANSON , JEFFREY C

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

FEFFER , LAUREN B

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

12/17/2019:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

12/13/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/13/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION

12/12/2019:UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT

12/12/2019:AFFIDAVIT

ANSWER

12/06/2019:ANSWER

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/06/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

12/06/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/06/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

12/06/2019:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

12/06/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $980.60 ON RECEIPT 3434881

11/26/2019:PAID $980.60 ON RECEIPT 3434881

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/26/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION; Notes:TO THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST EILEEN WEINBERG DECEASED RESIDENCES AND LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESSES ARE UNKNOWN PUBLISH PBDBR ON 12/26/19 & 1/2/20 MANDATORY DATE 1/27/20 ** NO CPY MAILED **

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH; Notes:UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST EILEEN WEINBERG DECEASED FILED BY PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT - 12/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION; Notes:MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE E-FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes:IN SUPPORT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE OF PROCESS F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes:AFFIDAVITS OF DUE AND DILIGENT SEARCH F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes:TO COMPLAINT F/B DFT BRIDGEVIEW ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MARTIN BRUCE WEINBERG - 12/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:RETURN OF NON-SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MARTIN BRUCE WEINBERG - 12/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/26/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/26/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/26/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/26/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/26/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/26/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/26/2019; Description:Lis Pendens 2nd Page or additional pages $4.00; Amount Due:$4.00; Amount Paid:$4.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/26/2019; Description:Lis Pendens 1st Page $5.60; Amount Due:$5.60; Amount Paid:$5.60; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/26/2019; Description:8XDT Additional DFT over 5 $2.50; Amount Due:$5.00; Amount Paid:$5.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • FinancialDue Date:11/26/2019; Description:800F2 CircCivil Real Prop $50,001 < $250,000 PB; Amount Due:$906.00; Amount Paid:$906.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRIDGEVIEW ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Madison Alamosa Hecm Llc is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Feffer, Lauren B.