This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/22/2023 at 21:54:02 (UTC).

MACFARLANE, ROBERT V SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 MACFARLANE, ROBERT filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DELGADO , LUIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DELGADO , LUIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MACFARLANE , ROBERT

Defendants and Respondents

NEWELL BRANDS INC

SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BACA ESQ, GABRIEL A

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/02/2023:COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/02/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/02/2023:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/02/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/02/2023:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/02/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/02/2023:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/02/2023:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/02/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4765841

02/03/2023:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4765841

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/21/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC - 02/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED NEWELL BRANDS, INC - 02/06/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4765841; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $421.00; total Amount Paid: $421.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/03/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/03/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 02/03/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4765841; Notes: $421.00 4765841 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: litigation@victimaid.com ISSUED TO SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: litigation@victimaid.com ISSUED TO NEWELL BRANDS INC EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY OBO PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes: TO NEWELL BRANDS INC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST TO SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes: FIRST TO NEWELL BRANDS INC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO SUNBEAM PRODUCTS INC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes: SERVING FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO NEWELL BRANDS INC F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less