This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 05/18/2022 at 09:14:40 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V TOUSSAINT, MARIE PIERRE

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TOUSSAINT, MARIE PIERRE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BURKE , LAUREN and PARNOFIELLO , JOHN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BURKE , LAUREN

PARNOFIELLO , JOHN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant and Respondent

TOUSSAINT , MARIE PIERRE

Boynton Beach, FL 33426

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MAYERS , BREANNA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/21/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

03/21/2022:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS REQUESTED

03/21/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4394118

03/22/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4394118

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/30/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ORDER OF DEFAULT

04/22/2022:ORDER OF DEFAULT

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

04/22/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

MOTION FB PLT- TO ADOPT ORAL AGREEMENT AND CLOSE CASE

05/10/2022:MOTION FB PLT- TO ADOPT ORAL AGREEMENT AND CLOSE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FB PLT- TO ADOPT ORAL AGREEMENT AND CLOSE CASE; Notes: FB PLT- TO ADOPT ORAL AGREEMENT AND CLOSE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PTL ATTY PRESENT DFT NO APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DEFAULT; Notes: AND ORDER TO ADVANCE THE CAUSE WITHIN 45 DAYS - SIGNED JUDGE PARNOFIELLO 4/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: MB; Room: 6J (Main Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED MARIE PIERRE TOUSSAINT - 03/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4394118; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/22/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 03/22/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@ANDREUPALMA.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 4/21/2022 2:00 PM PARNOFIELLO, JOHN; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 4/21/2022 2:00 PM PARNOFIELLO, JOHN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4394118; Notes: $185.00 4394118 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RJ: County Civil Central - RJ (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYERS , BREANNA