Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/13/2021 at 19:37:07 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V MCCLASKEY, GLENN L

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MCCLASKEY, GLENN L. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SHULLMAN , SARAH L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SHULLMAN , SARAH L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant and Respondent

MCCLASKEY , GLENN L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

HINES , MICHELLE K

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

CASTELLANOS , J NICHOLAS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PENDING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT F/B DFT

04/07/2021:NOTICE OF PENDING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT F/B DFT

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

04/02/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

03/20/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/09/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/10/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3940686

03/10/2021:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3940686

SUMMONS REQUESTED

03/09/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/09/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:ZOOM DIVISION RE (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT F/B DFT; Notes:OF PENDING CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:NON-SERVICE RETURN GLENN L MCCIASKEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:F/B ATTY OBO DFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3940686; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$310.00; total Amount Paid:$310.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:03/10/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:03/10/2021; Description:400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due:$300.00; Amount Paid:$300.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:FLORIDA@MANDARICHLAW.COM E ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 4/8/2021 10:30 AM SHULLMAN, JUDGESARAH L; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 4/8/2021 10:30 AM SHULLMAN, JUDGESARAH L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 3940686; Notes:$310.00 3940686 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RE: County Civil Central - RE (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTELLANOS , J NICHOLAS