This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 07/15/2022 at 19:09:38 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V GRAHAM, CARLA

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GRAHAM, CARLA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, South County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CORLEW , REGINALD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CORLEW , REGINALD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant and Respondent

GRAHAM , CARLA

West Palm Beach, FL 33415-8805

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SHERON , MOURA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/15/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

06/15/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS REQUESTED

06/15/2022:SUMMONS REQUESTED

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

06/15/2022:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4503120

06/15/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4503120

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/20/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location: SB; Room: ZOOM DIVISION RD (South Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CARLA GRAHAM - 06/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4503120; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $185.00; total Amount Paid: $185.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/15/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 06/15/2022; Description: 406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due: $175.00; Amount Paid: $175.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: ESERVICE@TMPPLLC.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 7/13/2022 10:00 AM CORLEW, REGINALD; Notes: SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 7/13/2022 10:00 AM CORLEW, REGINALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4503120; Notes: $185.00 4503120 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes: F/B ATTY MOURA SHERON OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RD: South Branch County Civil Division - RD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHERON , MOURA