This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 22:44:42 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V GOLDEN, STEVE

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GOLDEN, STEVE. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHEESMAN , MAXINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHEESMAN , MAXINE

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant and Respondent

GOLDEN , STEVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

MASIN , HUNTER

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

GROSS , CLAUDIA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/23/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/23/2023:COMPLAINT

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

01/23/2023:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4751329

01/23/2023:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4751329

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/07/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/07/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT

02/24/2023:MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT; Notes: FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES F/B CLAUDIA GROSS ESQ OBO STEVE GOLDEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED STEVE GOLDEN - 02/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4751329; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $411.00; total Amount Paid: $411.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/23/2023; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • FinancialDue Date: 01/23/2023; Description: 800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due: $401.00; Amount Paid: $401.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4751329; Notes: $411.00 4751329 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: florida@mandarichlaw.com;abcfleservice@abclegal.com ISSUED TO STEVE GOLDEN EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AJ: Circuit Civil Central - AJ (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less