Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 04/21/2021 at 18:02:49 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC V CLECKLEY, SHARON

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CLECKLEY, SHARON. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant and Respondent

CLECKLEY , SHARON

Delray Beach, FL 33444-2232

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

OROVITZ , ROBERT J

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

04/20/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

04/16/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/16/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3991574

04/16/2021:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3991574

SUMMONS REQUESTED

04/16/2021:SUMMONS REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingSCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney; Location:MB; Room:ZOOM DIVISION RB (Main Branch)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED SHARON CLECKLEY, - 04/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3991574; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$185.00; total Amount Paid:$185.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:04/16/2021; Description:406FF County Civil Claim >$500 < $2500; Amount Due:$175.00; Amount Paid:$175.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:ESERVICE@HAYTFLA.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHA - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL ATTORNEY 5/18/2021 10:30 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S; Notes:SCPTHA - Small Claims Pretrial Attorney 5/18/2021 10:30 AM CASTOR, JUDGEFRANK S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 3991574; Notes:$185.00 3991574 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RB: County Civil Central - RB (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OROVITZ , ROBERT J