This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/11/2023 at 22:47:30 (UTC).

LONGBRIDGE FINANCIAL LLC V ZENA SHAPIRO AKA ZENA BOBROW SHAPIRO AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF HANNAH KRAKAUER DECEASED

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 LONGBRIDGE FINANCIAL LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ZENA SHAPIRO AKA ZENA BOBROW SHAPIRO AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF HANNAH KRAKAUER DECEASED. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HARPER , BRADLEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HARPER , BRADLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LONGBRIDGE FINANCIAL LLC

Defendants and Respondents

ESTATES OF SILVERLAKE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED

KOICIN , JANINE

SHAPIRO , ZENA

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

ZENA SHAPIRO AKA ZENA BOBROW SHAPIRO AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF HANNAH KRAKAUER DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

STARASOLER , TRACY

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WASSERSTEIN , DANIEL

STRAUSS , DAVID A

 

Court Documents

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/27/2023:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

02/27/2023:NOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION

UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION

02/27/2023:UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/22/2023:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

02/20/2023:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH

AFFIDAVIT

02/20/2023:AFFIDAVIT

UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION

02/20/2023:UNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/13/2023:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

02/13/2023:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/30/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/30/2023:COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE

01/30/2023:CERTIFICATE

LIS PENDENS

01/30/2023:LIS PENDENS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/30/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/30/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANT, THE ESTATES OF SIL VERLAKE PROPERTY OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INCORPORATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION - PUBLICATION; Notes: TO JANINE KOICIN 2733 SW 23RD CRANBROOK DRIVE BOYNTON BEACH FL 33436 PUBLISH PBDBR 3/7/23 & 3/14/23 MANDATORY DATE 4/6/23 ** CPY PROVIDE FOR MAILING **

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes: F/B DFT THE ESTATES OF SILVERLAKE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH; Notes: IRA S .VILLINSKY AFFIDAVIT AS TO JANINE KORCIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Notes: ROBERT A. MCLAIN AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION (F/B PLT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNISSUED NOTICE OF ACTION; Notes: JANINE KOICIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE ESTATES OF SILVERLAKE PROPERTY OWNERS' ASSOCIATION, INCORPORATED - 02/02/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE JANINE KOICIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ZENA SHAPIRO A/K/A ZENA BOBROW SHAPIRO - 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com ISSUED TO ZENA SHAPIRO AKA SENA BOBROW SHAPIRO AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF HANNA KRAKAUER DECEASED EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com ISSUED TO ZENA SHAPIRO AKA ZENA BOBROW SHAPIRO EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENTS EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com ISSUED TO THE ESTATES OF SILVERLAKE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: efile@raslg.com;flmail@raslg.com ISSUED TO JANINE KOICIN EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE; Notes: NOTICE OF SUBMITTING F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 34098 PAGE 1917-1917; Notes: F.B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: VALUE OF REAL OF REAL PROPERTY F/B BLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less