Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/08/2021 at 20:16:49 (UTC).

LOGAN, ROLAND V JAMES, JAMES DALE

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 LOGAN, ROLAND filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES, JAMES DALE. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LOGAN , ROLAND

Defendants and Respondents

JAMES , JAMES DALE

LHOIST NORTH AMERICA OF ALABAMA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LYTAL III, LAKE H

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BALDUCCI , MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

03/03/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/12/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

02/05/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3896405

02/03/2021:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3896405

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/01/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/01/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/01/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

02/01/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

02/01/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

02/01/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/01/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED JAMES DALE JAMES - 3/1/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS F/B ATTY BALDUCCI OBO DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED LHOIST NORTH AMERICA OF ALABAMA LLC - 02/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:3896405; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/03/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/03/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:02/03/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 3896405; Notes:$421.00 3896405 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT, LHOIST NORTH AMERICA OF ALABAMA, LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:TO DEFENDANT, JAMES DALE JAMES F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, LHOIST NORTH AMERICA OF ALABAMA, LLC F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY LYTAL III OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:tlytal@foryourrights.com;cwilkinson@palmbeachlaw.com AS TO LHOIST NORTH AMERICA OF ALABAMA, LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:tlytal@foryourrights.com;cwilkinson@palmbeachlaw.com AS TO JAMES DALE JAMES EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Balducci