This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 03/01/2019 at 17:39:46 (UTC).

LEVY, LESLIE M

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 LEVY, LESLIE M was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-SB

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Main Branch

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHOSBERG_FEUER , SAMANTHA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DONOFF , CRAIG

Decedent

LEVY , LESLIE M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DONOFF , LINDSEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • PAID $15.00 ON RECEIPT 3036790; Notes:$15.00 3036790 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes:F/B AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK (AENB) NO LTRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • EXPARTE CLERKS MEMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:ORIGINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 3013411; Notes:$401.00 3013411 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:IX: South Branch Probate - IX (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • WILL; Notes:ORIGINAL OF LESLIE M LEVY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • NOTICE OF TRUST; Notes:F/B CRAIG DONOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • NON-TAX CERT/RCPT/AFFIDAVIT; Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE F/B CRAIG DONOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DEATH CERT PROBATE DECEDENT; Notes:E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • OATH; Notes:OF P/R, AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT F/B CRAIG DONOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION; Notes:F/B CRAIG DONOFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • WILL; Notes:E-FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Receipt Number:3036790; Receipt Amount: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Receipt Number:3013411; Receipt Amount: $401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$416.00; total Amount Paid:$416.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • Due Date:02/13/2019; Description:CP Probate Service Charges PB; Amount Due:$15.00; Amount Paid:$15.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Due Date:01/28/2019; Description:500FF Formal Administration; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less