This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 03:57:48 (UTC).

LEONARD, DELLYAWN V ENDURANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 LEONARD, DELLYAWN filed an Other lawsuit against ENDURANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ABDELRAHIEM , ANGELA

LEONARD , DAYDREANA

LEONARD , DELLYAWN

Respondents and Defendants

CORNERSTONE ASSET DISPOSITION LLC

ENDURANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSENBACH , MARSHALL E

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

KOVEN , IAN

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

02/15/2022:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY

ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/02/2022:ORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

MOTION TO COMPEL

02/02/2022:MOTION TO COMPEL

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

01/07/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

12/21/2021:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/03/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/03/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/03/2021:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/11/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/11/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/11/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

10/11/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

10/11/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

10/11/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/11/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

10/11/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4171075

09/10/2021:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4171075

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/08/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY; Notes:DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER IMPLEMENTING DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN; Notes:GOODMAN DTD 02/02/2022: DEMAND FOR JURY AND THIS CASE IS DESIGNATED TO THE GENERAL TRACK FOR TIME TO DISPOSITION UNLESS ALL DFT(S) HAVE BEEN DEFAULTED AND/OR DROPPED. *** SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS ***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL; Notes:DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' COMPLETE RESPONSES TO INITIAL DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Notes:DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF REMOTE VIDEOCONFERENCE AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITIONS 01/10/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes:(1 DAY) TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' DISCOVEROY FILED BY ATTY ROSENBACH OBO PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:NOTICE OF TAKING REMOTE VIDEOCONFERENCE AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DELLYAWN LEONARD 01/14/2022 10:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:NOTICE OF TAKING REMOTE VIDEOCONFERENCE AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION ANGELA ABDELRAHIEM 01/10/2022 10:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Notes:NOTICE OF TAKING REMOTE VIDEOCONFERENCE AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DAYDREANA LEONARD 01/11/2022 10:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF F/B DFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/10/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/10/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/10/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4171075; Notes:$421.00 4171075 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:marshall@marshallrosenbach.com;service@marshallrosenbach.com AS TO ENDURANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:marshall@marshallrosenbach.com;service@marshallrosenbach.com AS TO CORNERSTONE ASSET DISPOSITION LLC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:F/B PLTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBACH , MARSHALL E