This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 06/22/2021 at 23:27:13 (UTC).

LAW OFFICE OF LYDIA CHARLES LLC V MCCLOUD, SHAWANA

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 LAW OFFICE OF LYDIA CHARLES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MCCLOUD, SHAWANA. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GOODMAN , JAIMIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GOODMAN , JAIMIE

 

Party Details

Defendants and Respondents

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEMSUNBELT INC

AESTHETIC SURGERY CENTER OF WINTER PARK LLC

AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

ALTAMONTE SPRINGS DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING INC

BENCHMARK ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES LLC

BETTER CARE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER LLC

CENTERS FOR MEDICARE AND MEDICAID SERVICES

CENTRAL FLORIDA HEALTH INC

CENTRAL ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGICAL LLC

FLORIDA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS KANG AND ASSOCIATES MD INC

FLORIDA SPINE AND ORHOPEDICS INC

HARRIDON LODGE ESQ , LATOYA

INJURED WORKERS PHARMACY LLC

KAHANA , ROBERTA D

KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS INC

LAW OFFICE OF LH LODGE PA

LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC

MALIK MD, RAZIA BEGUM

MCCLOUD , SHAWANA

MEDICAL CENTER RADIOLOGY OF DRS CURRY HARDING GEORGE & ELISCU PA

44 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

TISON , DEVIN P

 

Court Documents

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/22/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/22/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/16/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/16/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/16/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/16/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/16/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/16/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

06/16/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/19/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4031988

05/19/2021:PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4031988

PETITION

05/17/2021:PETITION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/17/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC - 06/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED CENTRAL FLORIDA HEALTH, INC - 06/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FLORIDA EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS KANG & ASSOCIATES, MD., INC - 06/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED KEY HEALTH MEDICAL SOLUTIONS, INC - 06/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED THE AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION ATTN: AHCA SECRETARY SIMONE MARSTILLER - 06/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ORLANDO HEALTH, INC - 06/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED ORLANDO HEALTH, LLC - 06/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE WINTER PARK, PLLC DBA UNIVERSITY DIAGNOSTIC INSTITUTE ATTN: GEORGE A. STANLEY, MD - 06/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED FLORIDA SPINE & ORTHOPEDICS, INC DBA ORLANDO NEUROSURGERY AND ORTHOPEDICS, INC & ORLANDO NED - 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED WEST ORANGE HEALTHCARE, INC - 06/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com AS TO DFT BETTER CARE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, LLC D/B/A BETTER CARE CHIROPRATIC CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com AS TO DFT BENCHMARK ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com AS TO DFT AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com AS TO DFT ALTAMONTE SPRINGS DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING, INC. D/B/ A ALTAM SPRGS DIAGN IMAGING INC AND MID FLORIDA IMAGING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com AS TO DFT AESTHETIC SURGERY CENTER OF WINTER PARK, L.L.C D/B/A THE AESTHETIC SURGERY CENTER OF WINTER PARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:service@myflattorney.com;mcabrera@myflattorney.com;mac@lawrct.com AS TO DFT ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM/SUNBELT INC DBA ADVENTHEALTH APOPKA FLORIDA AND APOPKA AND FLORIDA HOSPITAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4031988; Notes:$401.00 4031988 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AD: Circuit Civil Central - AD (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:FOR INTERPLEADER F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL FLORIDA HEALTH INC DBA LEESBURG REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC AAO MARTINIS MCDUFFIE is a litigant

Latest cases where INJURED WORKERS PHARMACY LLC A/AN FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL ORTHOPEDICS AND NEUROSURGICAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BETTER CARE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER LLC is a litigant