This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 11/15/2019 at 15:03:01 (UTC).

LAKIN, HOPE V KACZMARSKI, EDWARD

Case Summary

On 10/11/2019 LAKIN, HOPE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against KACZMARSKI, EDWARD. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CASTOR , FRANK S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Florida Palm Beach Court System

  • Courthouse:

    North County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CASTOR , FRANK S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LAKIN , HOPE

Defendant and Respondent

KACZMARSKI , EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROSENBERG , JAMES M

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

11/01/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30995 PAGE 1225-1226

10/30/2019:DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30995 PAGE 1225-1226

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

10/29/2019:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

CLERK'S DEFAULT

10/29/2019:CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/24/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

10/24/2019:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/22/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/17/2019:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/15/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3366933

10/15/2019:PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3366933

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/11/2019:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; Notes:FORWARD TO PBSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DISPOSED BY DEFAULT; Notes:DD - DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 30995 PAGE 1225-1226; Notes:OF RESIDENTIAL EVICTION DTD: 10/30/19 JUDGE CASTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes:MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF RESIDENTIAL EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S DEFAULT; Notes:LEGAL@SHIPPLAWOFFICE.COM ENTERED AGAINST DFT. E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes:MOTION.FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT -RESIDENTIAL EVICTION EDWARD KACZMARSKI CLERK LEGAL@SHIPPLAWOFFICE.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes:AFFIRAMIQENON:MILITARYSERVICE EDWARD KACZMARSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED EDWARD KACZMARSKI - 10/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:SERVICE@SHIPPLAWOFFICE.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAID $195.00 ON RECEIPT 3366933; Notes:$195.00 3366933 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt Number:3366933; Receipt Amount: $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Totals: total Amount Due:$195.00; total Amount Paid:$195.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Due Date:10/15/2019; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Due Date:10/15/2019; Description:401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due:$185.00; Amount Paid:$185.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less