This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 02/20/2023 at 22:44:17 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC V RICCIARDI, ROBERT J JR

Case Summary

On 01/11/2023 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against RICCIARDI, ROBERT J JR. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DELGADO , LUIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DELGADO , LUIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants and Respondents

RICCIARDI JR, ROBERT J

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LEWIS , COREY M

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WEBER , LAUREN H

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/16/2023:NOTICE OF HEARING

ORDER EXTENDING TIME

02/09/2023:ORDER EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER

02/09/2023:NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

02/07/2023:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY

MOTION FOR ORDER

02/07/2023:MOTION FOR ORDER

RESPONSE TO: DFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - F/B PLT

02/07/2023:RESPONSE TO: DFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - F/B PLT

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

02/07/2023:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/07/2023:MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

02/07/2023:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

PAID $945.60 ON RECEIPT 4740480

01/12/2023:PAID $945.60 ON RECEIPT 4740480

NOTICE OF FILING

01/11/2023:NOTICE OF FILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/11/2023:SUMMONS ISSUED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/11/2023:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

LIS PENDENS BOOK 34067 PAGE 1118-1118

01/11/2023:LIS PENDENS BOOK 34067 PAGE 1118-1118

COMPLAINT

01/11/2023:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/11/2023:CIVIL COVER SHEET

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Notes: NOTICE OF HEARING 03/30/2023 08:45:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER EXTENDING TIME; Notes: DELGADO; TO RESPOND TO PLTF'S COMPLAINT IS GRANTED; DFTS WILL HAVE 30 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER DTD 2/9/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER; Notes: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY; Notes: AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT - F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER; Notes: TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE - F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO: DFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - F/B PLT; Notes: DFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME - F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY; Notes: FILED BY ATTY WEBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Notes: TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FILED BY DFT RICCIARDI JR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes: AS COUNSEL FOR ROBERT RICCIARDI JR AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY ATTY WEBER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Notes: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $945.60 ON RECEIPT 4740480; Notes: $945.60 4740480 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: AG: Circuit Civil Central - AG (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@decubaslewis.com;corey.lewis@decubaslewis.com;courtXpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ACTING ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@decubaslewis.com;corey.lewis@decubaslewis.com;courtXpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO ROBERT J RICCIARDI JR AKA ROBERT RICCIARDI JR EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: eservice@decubaslewis.com;corey.lewis@decubaslewis.com;courtXpress@firmsolutions.us ISSUED TO THE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY EFILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 34067 PAGE 1118-1118; Notes: F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes: VERIFIED COMPLAINT F/B PLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less