This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 10/27/2021 at 19:50:15 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW CONDOMINIUM SYSTEM INC V HEVIA, ROMAN

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 LAKEVIEW CONDOMINIUM SYSTEM INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HEVIA, ROMAN. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LAKEVIEW CONDOMINIUM SYSTEM INC

Defendants and Respondents

HEVIA , ROMAN

ORTEGA , TERESA DEL SOCORRO LI

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROMAN HEVIA

UNKOWN SPOUSE OF TERESA DEL SOCORRO LI ORTEGA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

IGLESIAS , DAVID D

Other Attorneys

MCNAMARA , KEVIN L

 

Court Documents

MOTION MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN, ADMINISTRATOR, AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM

10/14/2021:MOTION MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN, ADMINISTRATOR, AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/08/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/08/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/08/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

10/08/2021:SERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/08/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/23/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $469.10 ON RECEIPT 4186403

09/23/2021:PAID $469.10 ON RECEIPT 4186403

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED NAME ON SUMMONS MUST EXACTLY MATCH NAME LISTED IN COMPLAINT.

09/22/2021:~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED NAME ON SUMMONS MUST EXACTLY MATCH NAME LISTED IN COMPLAINT.

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

09/22/2021:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

LIS PENDENS

09/22/2021:LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT

09/22/2021:COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/22/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Notes:FB DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN, ADMINISTRATOR, AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM; Notes:MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN, ADMINISTRATOR, AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING GDN AD LITEM; Notes:NUTT; KEVIN L MCNAMARA ESQ IS APPOINTED DTD 10/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION TWO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION ONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TERESA DEL SOCORRO LI ORTEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROMAN HEVIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURN- NOT SERVED; Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE TERESA DEL SOCORRO LI ORTEGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED ROMAN HEVIA - 10/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4186403; Receipt Amount: $469.10

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:david@dilegalgroup.com;mel@dilegalgroup.com;sandra@dilegalgroup.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSESSION TWO EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:david@dilegalgroup.com;mel@dilegalgroup.com;sandra@dilegalgroup.com AS TO UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION ONE EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket~~CORRECT AND RESUBMIT SUMMONS NOT ISSUED NAME ON SUMMONS MUST EXACTLY MATCH NAME LISTED IN COMPLAINT.; Notes:david@dilegalgroup.com;mel@dilegalgroup.com;sandra@dilegalgroup.com NAME ON SUMMONS MUST EXACTLY MATCH NAME LISTED IN COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:david@dilegalgroup.com;mel@dilegalgroup.com;sandra@dilegalgroup.com AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ROMAN HEVIA EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:david@dilegalgroup.com;mel@dilegalgroup.com;sandra@dilegalgroup.com AS TO TERESA DEL SOCORRO LI ORTEGA EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:david@dilegalgroup.com;mel@dilegalgroup.com;sandra@dilegalgroup.com AS TO ROMAN HEVIA EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS BOOK 32904 PAGE 1528-1528; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:FOR FORECLOSURE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNAMARA, KEVIN