This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 09:31:42 (UTC).

LAKESIDE TERRACE LLC V HARRIS, SLYKECIA

Case Summary

On 10/19/2022 LAKESIDE TERRACE LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HARRIS, SLYKECIA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LAKESIDE TERRACE LLC

Respondent and Defendant

HARRIS , SLYKECIA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/19/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4651539

10/19/2022:PAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4651539

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/19/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

10/19/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4653448

10/20/2022:PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4653448

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

10/21/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

ANSWER

10/31/2022:ANSWER

PAID $921.00 ON RECEIPT 4664492

10/31/2022:PAID $921.00 ON RECEIPT 4664492

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

10/31/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

11/03/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

MOTION TO DISBURSE MONIES. F/B PLT.

11/03/2022:MOTION TO DISBURSE MONIES. F/B PLT.

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS ; JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 11/4/22

11/04/2022:ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS ; JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 11/4/22

RETURNED MAIL

02/15/2023:RETURNED MAIL

RETURNED MAIL

02/17/2023:RETURNED MAIL

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes: AS TO SLYKECIA HARRIS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCHECK ISSUED; Notes: Court Registry(Led_ID: 615875 Case#: PER JUDGES ORDER DATED 11/4/22) Check #: 00116957 for $900 was disbursed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4681108; Receipt Amount: $900.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $2,016.00; total Amount Paid: $2,016.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 11/16/2022; Description: Registry disbursement; Amount Due: $900.00; Amount Paid: $900.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDISBURSEMENT REQUEST; Notes: 4681108 $900.00 LAKESIDE TERRACE LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS ; JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 11/4/22; Notes: MOTION TO DISBURSE FUNDS ; JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 11/4/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISBURSE MONIES. F/B PLT.; Notes: TO DISBURSE MONIES. F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4653448; Receipt Amount: $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4653448; Notes: $10.00 4653448 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4651539; Receipt Amount: $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 10/19/2022; Description: Summons $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 10/19/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes: F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes: F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $185.00 ON RECEIPT 4651539; Notes: $185.00 4651539 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less