This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/03/2022 at 19:14:43 (UTC).

LAKESIDE TERRACE APT LLC V MORGAN, DEBORAH

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 LAKESIDE TERRACE APT LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MORGAN, DEBORAH. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

LAKESIDE TERRACE APT LLC

Defendant and Respondent

MORGAN , DEBORAH

 

Court Documents

PAID $196.00 ON RECEIPT 4548774

07/25/2022:PAID $196.00 ON RECEIPT 4548774

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

07/25/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/27/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/28/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

08/02/2022:ANSWER

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

08/11/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/11/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

08/11/2022:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

08/12/2022:NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/17/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AS TO DFT. F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: F/B DFT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO DEBORAH MORGAN SERVED ON 06/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4548774; Receipt Amount: $196.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $196.00; total Amount Paid: $196.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/25/2022; Description: Summons $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/25/2022; Description: CC County Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $1.00; Amount Paid: $1.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/25/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $196.00 ON RECEIPT 4548774; Notes: $196.00 4548774 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKESIDE TERRACE LLC is a litigant