This case was last updated from Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts on 09/03/2022 at 19:14:59 (UTC).

LAKESIDE TERRACE APT LLC V HOLMES, SHALONDRA

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 LAKESIDE TERRACE APT LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against HOLMES, SHALONDRA. This case was filed in Palm Beach County 15th Judicial Circuit Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LAKESIDE TERRACE APT LLC

Defendant and Respondent

HOLMES , SHALONDRA

 

Court Documents

PAID $196.00 ON RECEIPT 4548726

07/25/2022:PAID $196.00 ON RECEIPT 4548726

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/25/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

07/25/2022:COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

07/27/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/28/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

ANSWER

07/29/2022:ANSWER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/08/2022:MOTION FOR DEFAULT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

08/08/2022:MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

08/08/2022:NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT

ORDER DIRECTNG DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY; ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION; AND ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ON POSSESSION - $1495 BY 4PM ON 8/25/22- MEDIATION ON 9/6/22 AT 1:30PM-JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/11/22

08/11/2022:ORDER DIRECTNG DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY; ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION; AND ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ON POSSESSION - $1495 BY 4PM ON 8/25/22- MEDIATION ON 9/6/22 AT 1:30PM-JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/11/22

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTNG DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY; ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION; AND ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ON POSSESSION - $1495 BY 4PM ON 8/25/22- MEDIATION ON 9/6/22 AT 1:30PM-JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/11/22; Notes: DIRECTNG DFT TO DEPOSIT FUNDS INTO THE COURT REGISTRY; ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION; AND ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ON POSSESSION - $1495 BY 4PM ON 8/25/22- MEDIATION ON 9/6/22 AT 1:30PM-JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/11/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT/REPORT; Notes: AS TO DFT. F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Notes: AS TO DFT. F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Notes: AS TO DFT. F/B PLT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Notes: F/B DFT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO SHALONDRA HOLMES SERVED ON 07/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4548726; Receipt Amount: $196.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $196.00; total Amount Paid: $196.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/25/2022; Description: 401FF County Civil Tenant Eviction; Amount Due: $185.00; Amount Paid: $185.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/25/2022; Description: CC County Civil Service Charges PB 01262020; Amount Due: $1.00; Amount Paid: $1.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/25/2022; Description: Summons $10.00; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $196.00 ON RECEIPT 4548726; Notes: $196.00 4548726 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAKESIDE TERRACE LLC is a litigant