This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 09/22/2022 at 12:46:02 (UTC).

LAKE WORTH PHYSICAL MEDICINE AS ASSIGNEE OF ANTONIO PERALES-PEREZ V PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 LAKE WORTH PHYSICAL MEDICINE AS ASSIGNEE OF ANTONIO PERALES-PEREZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, North County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-NB

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHENS , DEBRA MOSES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LAKE WORTH PHYSICAL MEDICINE AS ASSIGNEE OF ANTONIO PERALES-PEREZ

Defendant and Respondent

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KARTEN , LINDSAY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/22/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/22/2022:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4549119

07/26/2022:PAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4549119

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/26/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

07/27/2022:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

08/08/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP; Location: NB; Room: #1 (North Branch); Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketCancelled SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP on 9/6/2022 11:00:00 AM due to; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: WITH PREJUDICE F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED BEFORE HEARING; Notes: DB - DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes: AS TO PROGRESSIVE AMERICNA INSURANCE COMPANY 7/27/2022 CORPORATE DONNA MOCH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4549119; Receipt Amount: $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $65.00; total Amount Paid: $65.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/26/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/26/2022; Description: 403FF County Civil Claim < $100; Amount Due: $55.00; Amount Paid: $55.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: LINDSAY@KMWLEGAL.COM;LUANN@KMWLEGAL.COM E-ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPIP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PIP 9/6/2022 11:00 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES; Notes: SCPIP - Small Claims Pretrial PIP 9/6/2022 11:00 AM STEPHENS, DEBRA MOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $65.00 ON RECEIPT 4549119; Notes: $65.00 4549119 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RH: North Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RH (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lake Worth Physical Medicine, Inc. d/b/a Palm Beac is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARTEN , LINDSAY