This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 10/07/2021 at 19:49:01 (UTC).

KONIGSBERG, JOEL L V FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Case Summary

On 09/02/2021 KONIGSBERG, JOEL L filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NUTT , JAMES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NUTT , JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KONIGSBERG , JOEL L

Defendant and Respondent

FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SIMMS , JOELLE A

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 32898 PAGE 1869-1870

09/17/2021:FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 32898 PAGE 1869-1870

SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

09/13/2021:SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)

PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4164096

09/03/2021:PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4164096

PETITION

09/02/2021:PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/02/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/02/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDISPOSED BY JUDGE; Notes:DJ - DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 32898 PAGE 1869-1870; Notes:JNUTT DTD 9/17/21 FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND EXPUNGEMENT -GRANTED CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED); Notes:RETURN OF SERVICE SERVED FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORHTY, INC - 09/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4164096; Receipt Amount: $411.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$411.00; total Amount Paid:$411.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/03/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:09/03/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 4164096; Notes:$411.00 4164096 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AO: Circuit Civil Central - AO (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Notes:IN THE FORM OF A MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT CONFIRMING ARBITATION AWARD AND EPUNGEMENT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:jsimms@bressler.com;ktoulon@bressler.com AS TO FINANCIAL INDUSTRY REGULATORY AUTHORITY INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMMS , JOELLE A