This case was last updated from Florida Palm Beach Court System on 09/21/2021 at 19:57:13 (UTC).

KISSEL, EDWARD V SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 KISSEL, EDWARD filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against SUBARU OF AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Florida Palm Beach Court System, Main Branch located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KEYSER , GREGORY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MB

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KEYSER , GREGORY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KISSEL , EDWARD

Defendant and Respondent

SUBARU OF AMERICA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ARCILA , BRYAN

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MITCHELL , CHARLES P

 

Court Documents

NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDING ORDER

09/15/2021:NOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDING ORDER

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/14/2021:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

09/08/2021:ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

09/08/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL

NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

08/19/2021:NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION

PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4143969

08/18/2021:PAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4143969

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/17/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

08/17/2021:NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/17/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/17/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT

08/17/2021:COMPLAINT

DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

08/17/2021:DIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/17/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

08/17/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE NOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDING ORDER; Notes:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Notes:TO PLTS COMPLAINT F/B DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL; Notes:AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENTS ON BEHALF OF DFT SUBAR OF AMERCIA, INC F/B ATTY CHARLES P. MITCHELL OBO DFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION; Notes:F/B ATTY BRYAN ARCHILA OBO PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number:4143969; Receipt Amount: $421.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialTotals: total Amount Due:$421.00; total Amount Paid:$421.00; total-Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/18/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/18/2021; Description:e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due:$10.00; Amount Paid:$10.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • FinancialDue Date:08/18/2021; Description:800FF - Circuit Civil General PB; Amount Due:$401.00; Amount Paid:$401.00; Amount Balance:$0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $421.00 ON RECEIPT 4143969; Notes:$421.00 4143969 Fully Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes:AA: Circuit Civil Central - AA (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:TO DEFENDNAT F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Notes:F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes:AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS F/B PLT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDIFFERENTIATED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN STANDING ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes:barcila@consumerlawcenter.com;ngerani@consumerlawcenter.com;nordaz@consumerlawcenter.com AS TO SUBARU OF AMERICA INC EFILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Subaru of America, Inc., a New Jersey corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARCILA, BRYAN