This case was last updated from Palm Beach County Courts on 10/13/2022 at 02:05:00 (UTC).

KISLUKHIN, GALINA V DEUTSCHE LUFTHANSA AG

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 KISLUKHIN, GALINA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEUTSCHE LUFTHANSA AG. This case was filed in Palm Beach County Courts, West County Courthouse located in Palm Beach, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALIJEWICZ , SARA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-WB

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Palm Beach, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALIJEWICZ , SARA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KISLUKHIN , GALINA

Respondent and Defendant

DEUTSCHE LUFTHANSA AG

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/20/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

07/22/2022:COMPLAINT

PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4546816

07/22/2022:PAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4546816

SUMMONS ISSUED

07/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

08/30/2022:HEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR NEW SERVICE PACKET AND SUMMONS-JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/30/22

08/30/2022:ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR NEW SERVICE PACKET AND SUMMONS-JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/30/22

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

09/22/2022:VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingCANCELLED - SCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se; Location: WB; Room: #2 (West Branch); Notes: VOL DISM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCancelled SCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se on 10/11/2022 1:30:00 PM due to; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDISMISSED AFTER HEARING; Notes: DA - DISMISSED AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Notes: F/B PLT AS PRO SE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • HearingSCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se; Location: WB; Room: #2 (West Branch); Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR NEW SERVICE PACKET AND SUMMONS-JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/30/22; Notes: MOTION FOR NEW SERVICE PACKET AND SUMMONS-JUDGE ALIJEWICZ DTD 8/30/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING BY COURT PRETRIAL; Notes: PLT/PRESENT DFT/NO APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PRO SE 10/11/2022 1:30 PM ALIJEWICZ, SARA; Notes: SCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se 10/11/2022 1:30 PM ALIJEWICZ, SARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 4546816; Receipt Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialTotals:; total Amount Due: $310.00; total Amount Paid: $310.00; total-Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/22/2022; Description: e-Filed SMS PB; Amount Due: $10.00; Amount Paid: $10.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • FinancialDue Date: 07/22/2022; Description: 400FF County Civil Claim >$2500<= $15000; Amount Due: $300.00; Amount Paid: $300.00; Amount Balance: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; Notes: DVORKINA@GMAIL.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketSET FOR SCPTHP - SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL PRO SE 8/30/2022 1:30 PM ALIJEWICZ, SARA; Notes: SCPTHP - Small Claims Pretrial Pro Se 8/30/2022 1:30 PM ALIJEWICZ, SARA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAID $310.00 ON RECEIPT 4546816; Notes: $310.00 4546816 Fully Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDIVISION ASSIGNMENT; Notes: RA: West Branch Cty Civ, SC, Evictions - RA (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Notes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Lufthansa AG is a litigant